This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/31/2019 at 14:30:09 (UTC).

CENTRAL FLORIDA PROPERTY MANAG Et Al VS BRODSKY, JARED Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 CENTRAL FLORIDA PROPERTY MANAG filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRODSKY, JARED. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RITENOUR, ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTRAL FLORIDA PROPERTY MANAG

GILROY, PHILIP

TANG, MAE LEE

Defendants

SANCHEZ, BETSY

BRODSKY, JARED

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

05/21/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

05/17/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (JARED / BETSY)

05/17/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (JARED / BETSY)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/09/2019 (BETSY) POSTED

05/14/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/09/2019 (BETSY) POSTED

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/09/2019 (JARED) POSTED

05/14/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/09/2019 (JARED) POSTED

RECEIPT MX 168853

05/07/2019:RECEIPT MX 168853

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (BETSY)

05/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (BETSY)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (JARED)

05/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (JARED)

AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

05/07/2019:AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

3 - DAY NOTICE

05/07/2019:3 - DAY NOTICE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

05/07/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY CSD (JARED / BETSY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/09/2019 (BETSY) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/09/2019 (JARED) POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT MX 168853

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 168853

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (BETSY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO HCSO BY CKW (JARED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO PROPERTY MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 3 - DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Case 282019CC000266CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY assigned

    Read MoreRead Less