This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 14:30:59 (UTC).

CELAYA, LUIS F VS FREEMAN, AUTUMN NICOLE

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 CELAYA, LUIS F filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FREEMAN, AUTUMN NICOLE. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY and RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL). The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CELAYA, LUIS F

Defendant

FREEMAN, AUTUMN NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CELAYA, ROBERTO PABLO

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY AG

06/17/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY AG

WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

06/17/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

ORDER ON TENANT REMOVAL

06/13/2019:ORDER ON TENANT REMOVAL

MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

06/06/2019:MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (AUTUMN)

06/06/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (AUTUMN)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

06/06/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/29/2019 (AUTUMN) SUB

06/03/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/29/2019 (AUTUMN) SUB

EPORTAL RECEIPT

05/29/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (AUTUMN)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (AUTUMN)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

05/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY ROBERTO P CELAYA FOR PLTF)

05/29/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY ROBERTO P CELAYA FOR PLTF)

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT REMOVAL (WITH LEASE ATTACHED & 3DAY NOTICE)

05/29/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT REMOVAL (WITH LEASE ATTACHED & 3DAY NOTICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY AG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY AG (AUTUMN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS SERVED ON 5/29/2019 (AUTUMN) SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (AUTUMN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Judge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY ROBERTO P CELAYA FOR PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT REMOVAL (WITH LEASE ATTACHED & 3DAY NOTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 170042

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 282019CC000330CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less