This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 13:23:39 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS REBMANN, SARAH

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REBMANN, SARAH. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

REBMANN, SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JEFFREY LEE

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION

02/26/2020:ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/20/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT **PROPOSED**

02/20/2020:STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT **PROPOSED**

DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM (ATTYS APPEARED FOR BOTH - CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL TO 3/3/20 @ 1PM PENDING POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT - THIS IS ONLY NOTICE)

01/07/2020:DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM (ATTYS APPEARED FOR BOTH - CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL TO 3/3/20 @ 1PM PENDING POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT - THIS IS ONLY NOTICE)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/27/2019 (SARAH) IND

12/28/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 12/27/2019 (SARAH) IND

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/05/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/05/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (SARAH)

12/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (SARAH)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/05/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/03/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETAINING JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 3/3/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 2/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR PAYMENT **PROPOSED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 3/3/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 1/7/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 1/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/07/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMORANDUM (ATTYS APPEARED FOR BOTH - CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL TO 3/3/20 @ 1PM PENDING POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT - THIS IS ONLY NOTICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 181982

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000789SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less