This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 09/06/2019 at 17:30:15 (UTC).

CARUSO, ANDREW, CARUSO, FRANCES Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 CARUSO, ANDREW, CARUSO, FRANCES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARUSO, ANDREW

Decedent

CARUSO, FRANCES

Not Classified By Court

CARUSO, KAREN

CARUSO-ALLEN, ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

BROWN, SHARON KRINSKY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Petitioner Attorney: Sharon K Brown Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Decedent Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (Testate nonresident decedent - single petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 07/08/1991

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING * PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT * KAREN CARUSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Case 282019CP000365PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less