This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 09/06/2019 at 17:32:02 (UTC).

CARLSON, CAROL, CARLSON, NANCY Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 CARLSON, CAROL, CARLSON, NANCY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CARLSON, CAROL

CARLSON, NANCY

Decedent

CARLSON, VIVIAN ANDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOGAERT, JOY MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS *9/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Case Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING NONRESIDENT WILL TO RECORD ACCOUNTING TO FLORIDA STATUTES 734.1025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ORIGINAL AFF OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * NANCY CARLSON a/k/a NANCY MARIE CARLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 03/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $231.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • TRANSCRIPT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • PETITION TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT WILL TO RECORD ACCORDING TO FLORIDA STATUTES 734.1025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE 03/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * NANCY CARLSON a/k/a NANCY MARIE CARLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * CAROL CARLSON A/K/A CAROL SHARON CARLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Case 282019CP000366PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOGAERT, JOY MARIE