This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/27/2022 at 15:37:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. VS SANCHEZ, ANGELA M

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANCHEZ, ANGELA M. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

SANCHEZ, ANGELA M

Sebring, FL 33870-7950

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (PLTF'S ATTY)

09/27/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (PLTF'S ATTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ANGELA)

09/27/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ANGELA)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

09/27/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ANGELA)

09/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ANGELA)

SUMMONS SERVED 10/07/22 (ANGELA) IND

10/17/2022:SUMMONS SERVED 10/07/22 (ANGELA) IND

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/15/2022 14:30; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 10/07/22 (ANGELA) IND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 10/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ANGELA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 11/15/2022 at 0230 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ANGELA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (PLTF'S ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 244067

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase 282022SC000755SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin