This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:01:11 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS WELSHHONS, RANDALL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WELSHHONS, RANDALL. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

WELSHHONS, RANDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

04/21/2020:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

04/07/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (RANDALL)

04/07/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (RANDALL)

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

04/07/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

01/28/2020:DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

SUMMONS SERVED 1/10/2020 (RANDALL) IND

01/23/2020:SUMMONS SERVED 1/10/2020 (RANDALL) IND

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (RANDALL)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (RANDALL)

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (RANDALL)

12/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (RANDALL)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

12/19/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (RANDALL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 1/28/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 1/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/28/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 1/10/2020 (RANDALL) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR disposition on 1/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000810SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less