This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:05:16 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS STANLEY, JESSICA L

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STANLEY, JESSICA L. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

STANLEY, JESSICA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING (JULY 21, 2020 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

07/09/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING (JULY 21, 2020 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 4/09/2020 (JESSICA) IND

04/16/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 4/09/2020 (JESSICA) IND

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL COURT DATE (7/21/2020 @ 1:00 PM)

04/02/2020:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL COURT DATE (7/21/2020 @ 1:00 PM)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

03/04/2020:EPORTAL RECEIPT

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JESSICA)

03/04/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JESSICA)

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

03/03/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JESSICA)

01/23/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JESSICA)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JESSICA)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (JESSICA)

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JESSICA)

12/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (JESSICA)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

12/19/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/21/2020 14:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 07/21/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (JULY 21, 2020 @ 2:00 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 7/21/2020 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 7/21/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESET (CC/SC) on 7/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/21/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS SERVED ON 4/09/2020 (JESSICA) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL COURT DATE (7/21/2020 @ 1:00 PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 7/21/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 4/21/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESCHEDULED on 4/2/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000811SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less