This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 12:02:50 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS LONG, HOLLY L

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against LONG, HOLLY L. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL) and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

LONG, HOLLY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/26/2020:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED ON 1/08/2020 (HOLLY) SUB

01/17/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 1/08/2020 (HOLLY) SUB

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (HOLLY)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (HOLLY)

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (HOLLY)

12/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (HOLLY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

12/19/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

COMPLAINT

12/19/2019:COMPLAINT

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 1/08/2020 (HOLLY) SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (HOLLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (HOLLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182887

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019CC000822CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less