This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 14:05:25 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS ADA T HART

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADA T HART. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL), ANTHONY RITENOUR and RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL)

ANTHONY RITENOUR

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

ADA T HART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/30/2020:ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED ON 1/08/2020 (ADA) IND

01/17/2020:SUMMONS SERVED ON 1/08/2020 (ADA) IND

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DSIMISSAL **PROPOSED**

01/17/2020:STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DSIMISSAL **PROPOSED**

EPORTAL RECEIPT

12/19/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ADA)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ADA)

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ADA)

12/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ADA)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

12/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

12/19/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/19/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/28/2020 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: HIGHLANDS CO COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 1/08/2020 (ADA) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 1/28/2020 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results CANCELLED on 1/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DSIMISSAL **PROPOSED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (ADA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 1/28/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY: POLLACK & ROSEN, PA/ KEVIN SPINOZZA FOR PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 182875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase 282019SC000812SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less