This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 06/13/2019 at 17:30:21 (UTC).

CANAVAN, WILLIAM T, SCHLABACH, LOIS MARIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 CANAVAN, WILLIAM T, SCHLABACH, LOIS MARIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Decedent

SCHLABACH, LOIS MARIE

Not Classified By Court

CANAVAN, WILLIAM T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

CANAVAN, WILLIAM THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 7/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * WILLAIM T. CANAVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Personal Rep Attorney: WILLIAM T CANAVAN Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * WILLIAM T. CANAVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 169821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Case 282019CP000241PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less