This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/26/2019 at 17:31:48 (UTC).

BUTLER, TANYA SELENE, LAMMEY, CULMER E JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 BUTLER, TANYA SELENE, LAMMEY, CULMER E JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Decedent

LAMMEY, CULMER E JR

Not Classified By Court

BUTLER, TANYA SELENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 175065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $12.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $12.00 Balance Remaining $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - BRANDON K BURWELL 1/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - MARIA LAMMEY 1/8/15

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 2/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Case 282019CP000352PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAIG, BRANDON SCOTT