This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 09/06/2019 at 17:31:02 (UTC).

BLANCHARD, TYRONE C, PONTIOUS, KATHLEEN A Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 BLANCHARD, TYRONE C, PONTIOUS, KATHLEEN A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

BLANCHARD, TYRONE C

Decedent

PONTIOUS, KATHLEEN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DISLER, MICHAEL M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS *9/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DISCLAIMER AND RENUNCIATION *BETH L BLANCHARD (REDOCKETED TO RECORD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DISCLAIMER AND RENUNCIATION- BETH BLANCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 175087

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $3.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE - 8/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * TYRONE C. BLANCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (tesatate Florida resident - single petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 174675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Case 282019CP000364PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DISLER, MICHAEL M