This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 12/16/2021 at 13:36:36 (UTC).

BETANCOURT, GRISELLE Et Al VS BIGGANE, MARLENE KAY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 BETANCOURT, GRISELLE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BIGGANE, MARLENE KAY. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BETANCOURT, LUIS

BETANCOURT, GRISELLE

Defendant

BIGGANE, MARLENE KAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

11/16/2021:COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

11/16/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

EPORTAL RECEIPT

11/16/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

11/18/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (MARLENE BIGGANE)

11/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (MARLENE BIGGANE)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

11/18/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS SERVED 11/23/2021 (MARLENE) IND

11/24/2021:SUMMONS SERVED 11/23/2021 (MARLENE) IND

ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

12/07/2021:ORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ESTABLISHING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED 11/23/2021 (MARLENE) IND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (MARLENE BIGGANE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 222843

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 222676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $409.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase 282021CA000391GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOVER, MYLES ALEXANDER