This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 17:35:09 (UTC).

BELL, HAZEL L, BELL, RUSSELL D Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 BELL, HAZEL L, BELL, RUSSELL D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELL, RUSSELL D

Claimant

STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HE

Decedent

BELL, HAZEL L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCCLURE, JOHN KELLY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEstate Claim for $4,245.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM *STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTHCARE ADMINISTRATION $4245.12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS *AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS *9/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketLETTER *FROM MCCLURE & LOBOZZO ATTY'S AT LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE *6/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADM GREATER THAN $1,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CP000347PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less