This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 17:32:14 (UTC).

BARTOLOMEO, PHEBE R

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 BARTOLOMEO, PHEBE R was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

BARTOLOMEO, PHEBE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

STONE, CHARLOTTE COMBS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to ACTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTRUST - Notice of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPersonal Rep Attorney: CHARLOTTE COMBS STONE Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197377

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $41.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE 8/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketTRUST - Notice of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CP000346PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less