This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 17:31:33 (UTC).

BARNES, ELAINE E, BARNES, REGINALD G Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 BARNES, ELAINE E, BARNES, REGINALD G was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA JANE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARNES, REGINALD G

Decedent

BARNES, ELAINE E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketORDER DISPOSING PERSONAL PROPERTY W/O ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 3/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 197379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $231.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDISP OF PERS PROP W/O ADM WITH PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE 3/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 282020CP000348PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less