This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 11/09/2019 at 13:30:41 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS DOE, JANE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DOE, JANE. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants

DOE, JANE

POLLARD, ELDRIDGE BRYAN

DOE, JOHN

ELDRIDGE POLLARD SALES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHN, RONALD BRUCE

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLTF AND TO CHANGE STYLE OF CASE

01/27/2020:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLTF AND TO CHANGE STYLE OF CASE

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ELDRIDGE)

12/09/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY/NON MILITARY SERVICE (ELDRIDGE)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY BLJ (ELDRIDGE POLLARD SALES, INC)

12/10/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ISSUED BY BLJ (ELDRIDGE POLLARD SALES, INC)

PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (COMMERCIAL), AND DAMAGES, INCLUDING AWARD OF ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS

03/19/2020:PLTF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (COMMERCIAL), AND DAMAGES, INCLUDING AWARD OF ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS

ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLTF AND CHANGING STYLE OF CASE (GULF COAST BANK AND TRUST CO)

02/03/2020:ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLTF AND CHANGING STYLE OF CASE (GULF COAST BANK AND TRUST CO)

RETURNED MAIL (JANE DOE) **UNABLE TO FORWARD**

06/24/2020:RETURNED MAIL (JANE DOE) **UNABLE TO FORWARD**

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS (E-PORTAL)

03/23/2020:NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS (E-PORTAL)

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JANE DOE)

12/09/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JANE DOE)

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFS AS TO JOHN/JANE DOE

12/09/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFS AS TO JOHN/JANE DOE

SUMMONS SERVED ON 11/14/2019 (ELDRIDGE) IND

12/09/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 11/14/2019 (ELDRIDGE) IND

SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JOHN DOE)

12/09/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (JOHN DOE)

SUMMONS SERVED ON 11/14/2019 (ELDRIDGE POLLARDSALES, INC) CORP

12/09/2019:SUMMONS SERVED ON 11/14/2019 (ELDRIDGE POLLARDSALES, INC) CORP

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/09/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/09/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

RETURNED MAIL (JOHN DOE) **UNABLE TO FORWARD**

06/24/2020:RETURNED MAIL (JOHN DOE) **UNABLE TO FORWARD**

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ELDRIGE POLLARD SALES INC)

10/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ELDRIGE POLLARD SALES INC)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

10/31/2019:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JANE DOE)

10/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JANE DOE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ELDRIGE POLLARD SALES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JANE DOE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (JOHN DOE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ELDRIDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Judge: WARD , DAVID VINCENT Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM ($647,078.97)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EPORTAL RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 179688

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $1,955.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $1,955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Case 282019CA000570GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald B Cohn