This case was last updated from Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County on 10/25/2019 at 13:38:42 (UTC).

AVALOS, JACQUELINE VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 AVALOS, JACQUELINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN. This case was filed in Tenth Circuit Courts - Highlands County, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARD, DAVID VINCENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARD, DAVID VINCENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVALOS, JACQUELINE

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPATH, CHRISTOPHER PETER

Defendant Attorney

GELMAN, BRETT A

 

Court Documents

DEF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/09/2020:DEF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION (7/6/20)

06/25/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION (7/6/20)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

06/26/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS)

12/10/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF)

12/10/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF)

MUTUAL NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/26/2019:MUTUAL NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLTF)

12/09/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLTF)

SUMMONS SERVED 10/3/19 (GEICO) CORP

10/29/2019:SUMMONS SERVED 10/3/19 (GEICO) CORP

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (2/3/2020 @ 10:00 AM- JACQUELINE AVALOS)

10/30/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (2/3/2020 @ 10:00 AM- JACQUELINE AVALOS)

REPLY TO DEF'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/22/2019:REPLY TO DEF'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/17/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/17/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF, JACQUELINE AVALOS (DEF)

10/17/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF, JACQUELINE AVALOS (DEF)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (GEICO GENERAL INS CO)

10/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (GEICO GENERAL INS CO)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

10/01/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/01/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

10/01/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO DEF'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Defendant Attorney: BRETT GELMAN Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF, JACQUELINE AVALOS (DEF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL (ATTY GELMAN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF, GEICO GENERAL INS COMP'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLTF'S COMPLAINT (ATTY GELMAN FOR DEF- GEICO GENERAL INS COMP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (GEICO GENERAL INS CO)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 282019CA000522GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELMAN, BRETT