This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 08/25/2019 at 17:30:17 (UTC).

ALLWOOD, MARJORIE L, ALLWOOD, RANDAL M Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 ALLWOOD, MARJORIE L, ALLWOOD, RANDAL M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COWDEN, ANGELA J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Highlands County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Highlands County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COWDEN, ANGELA J

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

HUFFMAN, BONNIE J

ALLWOOD, RANDAL M

Decedent

ALLWOOD, MARJORIE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HAFF, TULA MICHELE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE WITHOUT BOND & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Compliance Letter of Admin has been created with due date of 10/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE - 7/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND *RANDAL M ALLWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Judge: COWDEN , ANGELA J Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • LAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING * LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF MARJORIE J. ALLWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING * LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF MARJORIE L. ALLWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE * BONNIE J. HUFFMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT * BONNIE J. HUFFMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 173897

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Case 282019CP000350PCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less