This case was last updated from Highlands County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 05:31:49 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMEN VS MATTERN, KATHLEEN E

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MATTERN, KATHLEEN E. This case was filed in Highlands County Courts, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN, RITENOUR, ANTHONY and ANTHONY RITENOUR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITENOUR, ANTHONY LYNN

RITENOUR, ANTHONY

ANTHONY RITENOUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMEN

Defendant

MATTERN, KATHLEEN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/31/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/31/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

08/31/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (KATHLEEN)

08/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY AG (KATHLEEN)

EPORTAL RECEIPT

08/31/2021:EPORTAL RECEIPT

SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/08/2021 (KATHLEEN) IND

09/09/2021:SUMMONS SERVED ON 9/08/2021 (KATHLEEN) IND

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (10/19/2021 @ 2:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

09/22/2021:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (10/19/2021 @ 2:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

10/19/2021:DISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

04/20/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT (KATHLEEN)

04/20/2022:AFFIDAVIT (KATHLEEN)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (KATHLEEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 10/19/2021 0230 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results HEARING COMPLETED on 10/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/19/2021 14:30; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/19/2021 13:00; Judge: RITENOUR, ANTHONY (CIVIL); Docket Type: PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION MEMO: DEFT FTA; FJ GRANTED UPON REC AFFIDAVITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING TIME (10/19/2021 @ 2:30 PM) **VIRTUAL ONLY**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 10/19/2021 at 0230 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL on 10/19/2021 0100 PM Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR results RESET (CC/SC) on 9/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ON 9/08/2021 (KATHLEEN) IND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE-TRIAL CONF CIVIL scheduled on 10/19/2021 at 0100 PM, VC - Judge ANTHONY RITENOUR presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Attorney: HAROLD E SCHERR Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: RITENOUR , ANTHONY (CIVIL) Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 217717

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase 282021SC000658SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Absolute Resolutions Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL