This case was last updated from Highlands County - Tenth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/01/2022 at 13:36:08 (UTC).

27 NORTH AP INC, 360 AUTO RENOVATION AND RESTOR Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 27 NORTH AP INC, 360 AUTO RENOVATION AND RESTOR was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Highlands County - Tenth Judicial Circuit Court, Highlands County Courthouse located in Highlands, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COWDEN, ANGELA JANE and ANGELA COWDEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Highlands, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COWDEN, ANGELA JANE

ANGELA COWDEN

 

Party Details

Defendants

27 NORTH AP INC

360 AUTO RENOVATION AND RESTOR

A AND L TIRES SERVICE LLC

A Y A PROFESSIONAL CLEANING

A G WELDING AND FABRICATION

ALANS NURSERY INC

ARIES AUTO BODY AND RESTORATIO

ART AND MIGUEL ENTERPRISES INC

ASP BEAUTY SUPPLIES AND ACCESS

AYALACORP LLC

AZUL TEQUILA

B AND B HEALTH AID LLC

BAKED HIPPIES CO

BAKER SALES CORP

BASIC BICYCLE

BAZILE NURSERY

BEAT BABES COUTURE

BEST BEHAVIORAL SOLUTIONS LLC

BONGS FOR BADDIES CO

BORINQUEN TIMBER

79 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/03/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION

06/03/2022:PETITION

CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING (8/31/22 @ 9AM) - VIRTUAL 3A

06/07/2022:CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING (8/31/22 @ 9AM) - VIRTUAL 3A

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIRTUAL COURTROOM (8/31/22 @ 9:0AM) PETITION FOR THE COLLECTION OF DELINQUENT PERSON PROPERTY TAXES

06/28/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIRTUAL COURTROOM (8/31/22 @ 9:0AM) PETITION FOR THE COLLECTION OF DELINQUENT PERSON PROPERTY TAXES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/31/2022 09:00; Judge: COWDEN, ANGELA JANE; Docket Type: CIRCIVH; Location: VIRTUAL COURT Virtua

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIRTUAL COURTROOM (8/31/22 @ 9:0AM) PETITION FOR THE COLLECTION OF DELINQUENT PERSON PROPERTY TAXES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING (8/31/22 @ 9AM) - VIRTUAL 3A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEvent CIRCIVH scheduled on 8/31/2022 at 0900 AM, VC - Judge ANGELA COWDEN presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketJudge: COWDEN , ANGELA JANE Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received. Receipt Number: MX 236627

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $860.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketAttorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $860.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase 282022CA000191GCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/3/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less