This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 18:40:25 (UTC).

Zwar, Donald vs Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/11/2022 Zwar, Donald filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul, Huey, Paul L and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9500

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul L

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zwar, Beverly

Zwar, Donald

Defendant

Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRERA , AMY MARIE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

01/12/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

12/28/2022: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/26/2022: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/18/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/18/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/18/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/18/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING

12/18/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

NOTICE OF SERVING

12/18/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/14/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/14/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/14/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/11/2022: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/11/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY C/O R/A CFO- 11/22/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Owners Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Owners Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Owners Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Owners Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Owners Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Zwar, Beverly; Plaintiff: Zwar, Donald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less