This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/28/2019 at 12:07:11 (UTC).

ZUMBADO, MARVIN J vs BOUTROS, NATALIE

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 ZUMBADO, MARVIN J filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOUTROS, NATALIE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Marlewski, Christine Ann, Marlewski, Ann .. Christine and Marlewski, Ann. Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8320

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Marlewski, Christine Ann

Marlewski, Ann .. Christine

Marlewski, Ann. Christine

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

Tampa, FL 33614

Respondent

BOUTROS, NATALIE

Odessa, FL 33556

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANCHEZ , NILO JOSE, Jr

Attorney at SANCHEZ AND ASSOCIATES PA

1006 N Armenia Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Respondent Attorney

AHMED , SYED SHARIK

Attorney at LEGAL ADVOCATE GROUP, P.A.

2011 W Cleveland St Ste A

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J; Respondent: BOUTROS, NATALIE; Signed: 07/11/2019; Judicial Officer: Marlewski, Christine Ann; Vol./Book: 26787, Page: 1114, Number of Pages: 1114

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: BOUTROS, NATALIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Comment: AND WAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J; Respondent: BOUTROS, NATALIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: BOUTROS, NATALIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: RESCHEDULING; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/26/2019; Judicial Officer: Marlewski, Christine Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: BOUTROS, NATALIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketOUTCOME OF FAMILY MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketINITIAL JURISDICTION ORDER; Additional Info: Date 2: 04/03/2019; Judicial Officer: Marlewski, Christine Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J; Private Attorney: AHMED , SYED SHARIK; Private Attorney: SANCHEZ , NILO JOSE, Jr; Respondent: BOUTROS, NATALIE; Date Signed: 04/02/2019; Judicial Officer: Marlewski, Christine Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: FL DL OF MARVIN ZUMBADO JR; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCOURT INTERPRETER DETERMINATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCOVERSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: ZUMBADO, MARVIN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 403 800 E TWIGGS TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Marlewski, Christine Ann

    Read MoreRead Less