This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/30/2021 at 02:54:55 (UTC).

YOUNG, SCOTT vs GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 YOUNG, SCOTT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5066

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG, SCOTT

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CREMEENS , PATRICK J

Attorney at CREMEENS LAW GROUP PLLC

5100 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 270

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/18/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: TO TRANSFER CASE FROM CIVIL TO CIRCUIT CIVIL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YOUNG, SCOTT; Private Attorney: CREMEENS , PATRICK J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION N PER AO S-2021-057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: ( FEES PAID ); Additional Info: Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YOUNG, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YOUNG, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YOUNG, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: YOUNG, SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CREMEENS, PATRICK