This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/08/2019 at 15:58:31 (UTC).

YES COMPANIES WFC LLC vs CHRISTAL, CONNIE R

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 YES COMPANIES WFC LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CHRISTAL, CONNIE R. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellison, McKee. Alissa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7380

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ellison, McKee. Alissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARKWOOD ESTATES

YES COMPANIES WFC LLC

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B

Tampa, FL 33605

YES HOMESALES LLC

1701 N. 20Th Street Suite B

Tampa, FL 33605

Defendants

JINKERSON, ROSALIE

Plant City, FL 33566

CHRISTAL, APRIL LYNN

Plant City, FL 33566

ROSE, MATTHEW PAUL

Plant City, FL 33566

CHRISTAL, CONNIE R

Plant City, FL 33566

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VATALARO , RYAN JOHN

Attorney at ATLAS LAW

1701 N 20Th St Ste B

Tampa, FL 33605

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/12/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/28/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

01/23/2019: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

01/29/2019: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

01/10/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/11/2019: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/23/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

01/23/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/31/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/27/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/27/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/27/2018: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: CHRISTAL, CONNIE R; Date 2: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: JINKERSON, ROSALIE; Date 2: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: ROSE, MATTHEW PAUL; Date 2: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: CHRISTAL, APRIL LYNN; Date 2: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Comment: EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PLTF TO- brian@atlaslaw.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC; Plaintiff Doing Business As: PARKWOOD ESTATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CHRISTAL, APRIL LYNN; Defendant: CHRISTAL, CONNIE R; Defendant: JINKERSON, ROSALIE; Defendant: ROSE, MATTHEW PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: AS TO COUNT I (POSSESSION); Additional Info: Defendant: CHRISTAL, APRIL LYNN; Defendant: CHRISTAL, CONNIE R; Defendant: JINKERSON, ROSALIE; Defendant: ROSE, MATTHEW PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: CHRISTAL, APRIL LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: YES COMPANIES WFC LLC; Plaintiff: YES HOMESALES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019052685; Judge: Ellison, Alissa McKee

    Read MoreRead Less