This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/10/2020 at 17:16:46 (UTC).

Wright, Reginald P vs Adams Homes of Northwest Florida Inc

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Wright, Reginald P filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Adams Homes of Northwest Florida Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Rice, G. Elizabeth and Hinson, C.. Carl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1653

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Rice, G. Elizabeth

Hinson, C.. Carl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wright, Reginald P

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Wright, Conetha R

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant

Adams Homes of Northwest Florida Inc

C/O William Bryan Adams As Registered Agent 3000 Gulf Breeze Pkwy

Gulf Breeze, FL 32563

3Rd Party Defendants

BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE - FLORIDA, LLC

A&D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.

KA MASONRY, INC.

3Rd Party Plaintiff

ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

4Th Party Defendant

JB WDI INC.

4Th Party Plaintiff

BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE-FLORIDA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OBRIEN , NEIL PATRICK

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG P.A.

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

SMITH , KAVON PATRICK

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG, P.A.

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

ESPOSITO , LUCA G.

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

PRATICO , STEVEN CHARLES

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

401 E Jackson St Ste 2400

Tampa, FL 33602-5236

HUMPHRIES , LAUREN VIRGINIA

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

401 E Jackson St Ste 2400

Tampa, FL 33602

3Rd Party Defendant and 4Th Party Plaintiff Attorney

TUZZIO , GERARD ANDREW

Attorney at ROBERTS REYNOLDS BEDARD & TUZZIO, PLLC

7501 Wiles Rd Ste 201

Coral Springs, FL 33067

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/30/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/08/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/18/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/08/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/19/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/15/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/15/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/15/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/15/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/08/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/24/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/14/2020: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

04/22/2020: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/26/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/24/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/14/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/14/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LETTER FROM CLERK

03/17/2020: LETTER FROM CLERK

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT ON ALL COUNTS CONTAINED IN FOURTH-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST FOURTH-PARTY DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Fourth Party Plaintiff: BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE-FLORIDA LLC; Private Attorney: TUZZIO , GERARD ANDREW; Third Party Defendant: BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE - FLORIDA, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE MOTION; Additional Info: Private Attorney: TUZZIO , GERARD ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Fourth Party Defendant: JB WDI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: CLERK'S DEFAULT; Additional Info: Fourth Party Defendant: JB WDI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO NO CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE; Additional Info: Fourth Party Defendant: JB WDI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: TUZZIO , GERARD ANDREW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Fourth Party Defendant: JB WDI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wright, Conetha R; Plaintiff: Wright, Reginald P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wright, Conetha R; Plaintiff: Wright, Reginald P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Third Party Plaintiff: ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Adams Homes of Northwest Florida Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Adams Homes of Northwest Florida Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: DEF - PLT COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Adams Homes of Northwest Florida Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FL, INC., C/O WILLIAM BRYAN ADAMS AS RA, 2/25/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wright, Conetha R; Plaintiff: Wright, Reginald P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 PIService@florinroebig.com ; tdr@florinroebig.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Adams Homes of Northwest Florida Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wright, Conetha R; Plaintiff: Wright, Reginald P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wright, Conetha R; Plaintiff: Wright, Reginald P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wright, Conetha R; Plaintiff: Wright, Reginald P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wright, Conetha R; Plaintiff: Wright, Reginald P

    Read MoreRead Less