This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/10/2022 at 10:35:39 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II, LLC vs SEPULVEDA, MARTHA E

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SEPULVEDA, MARTHA E. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9201

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II, LLC

4730 South Ft Apache Rd Ste 300

Las Vegas, NV 89147-7947

Defendant

SEPULVEDA, MARTHA E

Tampa, FL 33614-3723

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUILES, MICHELLE MARIA

100 2Nd Ave. S Ste 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

08/23/2021: NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

08/19/2021: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

AFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

08/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

FOREIGN JUDGMENT

08/19/2021: FOREIGN JUDGMENT

Fee Worksheet

08/23/2021: Fee Worksheet

REGISTERED MAIL TO

08/23/2021: REGISTERED MAIL TO

REGISTERED MAIL TO

08/27/2021: REGISTERED MAIL TO

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD)

09/17/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (GREEN CARD); Additional Info: Defendant: SEPULVEDA, MARTHA E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: SEPULVEDA, MARTHA E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT PREPARED; Additional Info: Defendant: SEPULVEDA, MARTHA E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTERED MAIL TO; Additional Info: Defendant: SEPULVEDA, MARTHA E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quiles, Michelle Maria