This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/31/2019 at 13:04:57 (UTC).

Woodlief & Rush, P.A. vs North Park Isle Development, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Woodlief Rush, P A filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against North Park Isle Development, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, A. Robert and Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1050

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, A. Robert

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

Tampa, FL 33618

Brian P. Rush, P.A.

Tampa, FL 33618

Rush, Brian P

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendants

Financing Alternatives Inc

Hills, Tonya S

Hill, Jeffery S

Tampa, FL 33609

Eisenhower LLC

Plant City Acquisition, LLC

1407 W. Busch Blvd

Tampa, FL 33612

North Park Isle Development, LLC

111 S. Armenia Avenue Suite 201

Tampa, FL 33609

Chesapeake Bank (Maryland)

Eisenhower Property Group LLC

North Park Isle Community Development District

Trez Capital Group (Florida) GP LLC

Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Hurley Creek Townhomes Inc

Rushnell, Devon S

Bradenton, FL 34212

Chesapeake Bank (Virginia)

Po Box 1419

Kilmarnock, VA 22482

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSH , BRIAN P

Attorney at WOODLIEF & RUSH

3411 W Fletcher Ave Ste B

Tampa, FL 33618-2813

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/15/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY

02/15/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/24/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/24/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO QUASH

02/19/2019: MOTION TO QUASH

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/15/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/28/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2018: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: North Park Isle Development, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO QUASH; Comment: SUMMONS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR INSUFFICIENCY OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Financing Alternatives Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: OF DEFENDANT- NORTH PARK ISLE DEVELOPMENT, LLC,; Additional Info: Defendant: North Park Isle Development, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: OF DEFENDANT-NORTH PARK ISLE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT; Additional Info: Defendant: North Park Isle Community Development District

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Comment: RELATED CASES: 17-CA-4759, 18-CA-7553; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: brianprush.tampa@gmail.com ; servicecourtdocs.tampa@gmail.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Brian P. Rush, P.A.; Plaintiff: Rush, Brian P; Plaintiff: Woodlief & Rush, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NDNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY; Instrument Number: 2018503285; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NDNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY; Instrument Number: 2019080380; Judge: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019080330; Judge: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019080315; Judge: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Eisenhower Property Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSH , BRIAN P