Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/13/2021 at 09:17:22 (UTC).

WOODKE, ROBERT A. vs SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 WOODKE, ROBERT A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3207

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WOODKE, ROBERT A.

Tampa, FL 33610

WOODKE, AMANDA B.

Tampa, FL 33610

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

1001 Broadway Ave

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEWART , BRADFORD L

Attorney at STEWART LAW FIRM, P.A.

4909 Southfork Dr

Lakeland, FL 33813

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/15/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY, 4/26/21; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WOODKE, AMANDA B.; Plaintiff: WOODKE, ROBERT A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS FEE - service@stewartlawfirmpa.com ; bstewart@stewartlawfirmpa.com ; jgoheen@nationlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J DENNIS, ESQ