This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/04/2023 at 03:05:08 (UTC).

WISK, LYNNETTE vs SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 WISK, LYNNETTE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher, Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, Christopher C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0441

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, Christopher C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WISK, LYNNETTE

ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO

Defendants

SALCEDO, ALEXANDER

SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT , L. JAVAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING

03/31/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/30/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/03/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/03/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/10/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/09/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

12/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

12/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/22/2022: E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/22/2022: E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/21/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/21/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

LETTER TO

12/21/2022: LETTER TO

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO; Plaintiff: WISK, LYNNETTE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO; Plaintiff: WISK, LYNNETTE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: SALCEDO, ALEXANDER; Defendant: SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO; Plaintiff: WISK, LYNNETTE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO; Plaintiff: WISK, LYNNETTE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO; Plaintiff: WISK, LYNNETTE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO; Plaintiff: WISK, LYNNETTE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ESTATE OF HENEDINA MORTERA DANAO; Plaintiff: WISK, LYNNETTE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less