This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/11/2022 at 23:37:27 (UTC).

Windshield Warriors LLC vs Geico Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Windshield Warriors LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico Casualty Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, Jack. N and Gutman, N. Jack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4141

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, Jack. N

Gutman, N. Jack

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Windshield Warriors LLC a/a/o Caitlyn Boalch

14391 Spring Hill Dr. #502

Spring Hill, FL 34609

BOALCH, CAITLYN

Windshield Warriors LLC

14391 Spring Hill Dr. #502

Spring Hill, FL 34609

Defendant

Geico Casualty Company

Care Of Florida Chief Financial Officer 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN , KRISTY LEE

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF KRISTY L. JENSEN

14391 Spring Hill Dr # 502

Spring Hill, FL 34609

Defendant Attorney

POMERANTZ , JOSHUA MATTHEW

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/20/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/20/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/20/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/20/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/24/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/20/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/20/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EXHIBIT

01/20/2022: EXHIBIT

ANSWER- DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DISMISS

02/15/2022: ANSWER- DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DISMISS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/16/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

03/16/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER- DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: AND MOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Casualty Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Comment: PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Comment: PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Windshield Warriors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Windshield Warriors LLC aao Duane Oneal is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTY LEE JENSEN