This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/14/2020 at 19:16:57 (UTC).

WILSON, RICHARD vs GRAY, MEGAN DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 WILSON, RICHARD filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GRAY, MEGAN DANIELLE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0576

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON, RICHARD

Valrico, FL 33596

Defendants

GRAY, MEGAN DANIELLE

Brandon, FL 33511

HALL, CHERISH NICHOLE

Brandon, FL 33511

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

08/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

08/14/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

07/23/2020: MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

07/23/2020: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM

07/23/2020: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM

ANSWER NO RENT DEPOSIT

07/16/2020: ANSWER NO RENT DEPOSIT

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

07/13/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

07/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Comment: FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE FROM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER NO RENT DEPOSIT; Additional Info: Defendant: GRAY, MEGAN DANIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCLERK MAILED COPY OF RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: 7/11/2020 DEFT: MEGAN DANIELLE GRAY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less