This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/05/2021 at 05:38:09 (UTC).

WILSON, MATTHEW vs QUINTEROS-RUIZ, MARIA MARIBEL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 WILSON, MATTHEW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against QUINTEROS-RUIZ, MARIA MARIBEL. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoddard, C.. Ralph, Stoddard, Ralph. C. and Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7198

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

Stoddard, Ralph. C.

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON, MATTHEW

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendants

QUINTEROS-RUIZ, MARIA MARIBEL

Valrico, FL 33594

LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC.

Ra David L Evans, Mateer & Harbert, P.A. 225 E. Robinson St. #600

Orlando, FL 32801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , NICHOLAS TAYLOR

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

One Tampa City Center 201 N Franklin St

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

WALKER , JOSHUA BRIAN

Attorney at WALKER, REVELS, GRENINGER, NETCHER, PLLC

189 S Orange Ave Ste 1830

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/18/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/02/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/11/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/11/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/11/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/11/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/11/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021137217; Judge: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC.; Defendant: QUINTEROS-RUIZ, MARIA MARIBEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC.; Defendant: QUINTEROS-RUIZ, MARIA MARIBEL

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILSON, MATTHEW

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, NICHOLAS TAYLOR