This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 07:19:23 (UTC).

Wilson, Edward vs BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Wilson, Edward filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, K. Cheryl, Thomas, Cheryl. K, Polo, M.. Melissa and Polo, Melissa. M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0284

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa. M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilson, Edward

Pembroke Pines, FL 33024

Defendants

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CORPORATION

900 Ridgebury Road Aob Building

Ridgefield, CT 06877

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

900 Ridgebury Road Aob Building

Ridgefield, CT 06877

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION

900 Ridgebury Road Aob Building

Ridgefield, CT 06877

DOLGENCORP, LLC

100 Mission Rdg

Goodlettsville, TN 37072

GLAXOSMITHKLINE HOLDINGS (AMERICAS) INC

1105 N Market St Ste 622

Wilmington, DE 19801-1216

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

5 Crescent Drive

Philadelphia, PA 19112

PFIZER INC.

235 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC

3300 Publix Corporate Parkway

Lakeland, FL 33811

SANOFI US SERVICES INC.

55 Corporate Drive

Bridgewater, NJ 08807

SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC

Sanofi Building D, Corporate Dr

Bridgewater, NJ 08807

WALGREEN CO.

200 Wilmot Rd

Deerfield, IL 60015

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARAFINCZUK , JUSTIN R

Attorney at PARAFINCZUK WOLF

9050 Pines Blvd Ste 450-02

Pembroke Pines, FL 33024

Defendant Attorneys

HENNINGER , URSULA MARIE

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4700

Miami, FL 33131

THORN , ERIC MICHAEL

Attorney at ST. DENIS & DAVEY, P.A.

601 Bayshore Blvd Ste 630

Tampa, FL 33606

SHAPIRO , JAY BRIAN

Attorney at STEARNS WEAVER ET AL

150 W Flagler St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130

RODRIGUEZ, ALEJANDRO DAVID

Attorney at STEARNS WEAVER MILLER ET AL

150 W Flagler St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130-1545

MURATIDES , JOHN N

Attorney at STEARNS WEAVER ET AL

401 E Jackson St Ste 2100

Tampa, FL 33602

STEPANOVA , JULIA

Attorney at MS. JULIA STEPANOVA

3475 Piedmont Rd Ne Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30305

MARSHALL , FRED CONWELL, II

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

WEBB , JOSHUA CLARK

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON

Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/12/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

01/12/2022: COMPLAINT

LETTER TO

01/12/2022: LETTER TO

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/12/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

04/04/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/23/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/14/2022: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/14/2022: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

03/14/2022: AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/23/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/21/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516, FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Jay B. Shapiro; Additional Info: Defendant: PFIZER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PFIZER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PFIZER INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: DOLGENCORP, LLC; Private Attorney: THORN , ERIC MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC; Defendant: WALGREEN CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC; Defendant: WALGREEN CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.; Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Comment: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; JUDGE C. K. THOMAS 03/14/2022; Additional Info: Date Signed: 03/14/2022; Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.; Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: DOLGENCORP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilson, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilson, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilson, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilson, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilson, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: PAYMENT FOR SUMMONS WITHOUT REQUEST FOR SUMMONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOLGENCORP LLC 23373 is a litigant

Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant