Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/04/2021 at 05:13:03 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB vs ARROYAVE, JORGE H

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ARROYAVE, JORGE H. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3082

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY

10360 W State Road 84

Plantation, FL 33324

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

10360 W State Road 84

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendants

TENANT # 1, UNKNOWN

Tampa, FL 33603

ARROYAVE, JORGE H

Wesley Chapel, FL 33543

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A

100 Shockoe Slip

Richmond, VA 23219

CHASE BANK USA, N.A

1191 East Newport Center Suite

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

TENANT # 2, UNKNOWN

Tampa, FL 33603

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK

1191 East Newport Center Suite 101

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

ARAQUE, PAULA A

Wesley Chapel, FL 33543

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

Tampa, FL 33603

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

Tampa, FL 33603

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA

1191 East Newport Center Suite 101

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

CITY OF TAMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINHORN , LAUREN KARLA

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

10360 W State Road 84

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/18/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/16/2021: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

04/12/2021: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/12/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/09/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: ARROYAVE, JORGE H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JORGE H ARROYAVE, 4/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: PAULA A. ARAQUE, 4/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT #1, 4/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT #2, 4/13/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), 4/16/21, CORPORATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: ARAQUE, PAULA A; Defendant: ARROYAVE, JORGE H; Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A; Defendant: CHASE BANK USA, N.A; Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA; Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT # 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT # 2; Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x7; Additional Info: Defendant: ARAQUE, PAULA A; Defendant: ARROYAVE, JORGE H; Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A; Defendant: CHASE BANK USA, N.A; Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT # 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x7

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant