This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/17/2020 at 13:06:31 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB vs GARCIA, GERALDO

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GARCIA, GERALDO. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1471

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

450 N. Park Road, #800

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GERALDO GARCIA

Riverview, FL 33569

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

C/O Any Bank Manager Or Director 100 Shockoe Slip, 2Nd Floor

Richmond, VA 23219

GARCIA, GERALDO

Riverview, FL 33569

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

Tampa, FL 33602

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Riverview, FL 33569

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Riverview, FL 33569

ENCLAVE AT RAMBLE CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

C/O Janet Winfield, Registered Agent 9300 N. 16Th Street

Tampa, FL 33612

RIVERA, AMARILIS

Riverview, FL 33569

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMARILIS RIVERA

Riverview, FL 33569

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD , HARRIS SETH

Attorney at HOWARD LAW GROUP

450 N Park Rd Ste 800

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

BROWN , BARBARA MENDELL

Attorney at BROWN & ASSOCIATES LAW & TITLE, P.A.

11373 Countryway Blvd

Tampa, FL 33626

BOHNER , DALE KENT

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO. CLERK OF THE CIR

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602

COHEN , HARRY MICHAEL

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO. CLERK OF THE CIR

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602

MULLIS , BRANDON K, Esquire

Attorney at MANKIN LAW GROUP

2535 Landmark Dr Ste 212

Clearwater, FL 33761-3930

MULLIS , BRANDON K

Attorney at MANKIN LAW GROUP

2535 Landmark Dr Ste 212

Clearwater, FL 33761-3930

 

Court Documents

ORDER

07/24/2019: ORDER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/22/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

07/22/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

Plaintiff's Certification Form

05/09/2019: Plaintiff's Certification Form

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/24/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/02/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/29/2019: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/24/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

02/11/2019: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Defendant: GARCIA, GERALDO; Defendant: RIVERA, AMARILIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: FOR JUDICAL DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB; Date 2: 09/12/2019; Judicial Officer: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: ON 09/12/19 AT 9:00 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION AND WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT CLERK'S LEGAL COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT; Date 2: 07/23/2019; Judicial Officer: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: CLERKS - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY JUDICIAL AGAINST GERALDO GARCIA, AMARILIS RIVERA, CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. AND UNKNOWN TENANT #1; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.; Defendant: ENCLAVE AT RAMBLE CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC; Defendant: GARCIA, GERALDO; Defendant: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT; Defendant: RIVERA, AMARILIS; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMARILIS RIVERA; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GERALDO GARCIA; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 harris@howardlaw.com ; Pleadings@HowardLaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less