This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:54:47 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB vs Brown, Kimberly Marie

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brown, Kimberly Marie. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5517

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

C/O Brian L. Rosaler, 1701 W. Hillsboro Blvd. Suite 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

Defendants

Brown, Kimberly Marie

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Spouse of Kimberly Marie Brown

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER , BRIAN LEE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF POPKIN & ROSALER P A

1701 W Hillsboro Blvd Ste 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

06/29/2022: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

06/29/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

06/29/2022: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/29/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/29/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

06/29/2022: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

LIS PENDENS

06/29/2022: LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

RESPONSE

07/18/2022: RESPONSE

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

07/29/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/29/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 07/13/2022 DEFT KIMBERLY MARIE BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: (20 DAYS) 07/13/2022 SUBSTITUTE KIMBERLY MARIE BROWN/CO-RESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO SUMMONS SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: Brown, Kimberly Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Brown, Kimberly Marie; Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Kimberly Marie Brown; Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1; Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Brown, Kimberly Marie; Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosaler, Brian L