This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 01:30:42 (UTC).

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB vs Lopez, Thomas

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Lopez, Thomas. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3796

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

2005 Pan Am Circle, Suite 110

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

Florida Housing Finance Corporation

227 North Bronough Street Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1239

Hillsborough County

Tampa, FL 33602

Hillsborough County Clerk Of Court

Tampa, FL 33602

Lopez, Thomas

Tampa, FL 33603

State Of Florida

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Spouse Of Antonio Lopez

Tampa, FL 33603

Unknown Spouse Of Thomas Lopez

Tampa, FL 33603

Unknown Tenant #1

Tampa, FL 33603

Unknown Tenant #2

Tampa, FL 33603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZACHEM , BETTY C

Attorney at FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

227 N Bronough St Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301

KISER , AMY MARIE

2313 W Violet St

Tampa, FL 33603

Defendant Attorneys

KYLE , KEVIN JOHN

Attorney at KYLE & KYLE LAW

Ste 130 #6-103 3592 Broadway

Fort Myers, FL 33901

JONES , HASTINGS

Attorney at OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

107 W. Gaines St. Collins Bldg

Tallahassee, FL 32399

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/25/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

07/21/2022: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

REPLY

07/21/2022: REPLY

MOTION TO DISMISS

07/13/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER

06/27/2022: ANSWER

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/27/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

06/21/2022: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION

06/15/2022: NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION

ORDER ON

06/13/2022: ORDER ON

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: SEPTEMBER 8, 2022 @ 10:30AM- VIA ZOOM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY; Comment: TO ANSWER; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: Lopez, Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: State Of Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: State Of Florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Comment: FORECOSURE MEDIATION // JUDGE R. FICARROTTA; Additional Info: Defendant: Florida Housing Finance Corporation; Defendant: Hillsborough County; Defendant: Hillsborough County Clerk Of Court; Defendant: Lopez, Thomas; Defendant: State Of Florida; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Antonio Lopez; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Thomas Lopez; Defendant: Unknown Tenant #1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant #2; Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB; Private Attorney: KISER , AMY MARIE; Private Attorney: KYLE , KEVIN JOHN; Date Signed: 06/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON OBJECTION; Comment: TO DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON; Comment: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTAGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BETTY C ZACHEM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kiser, Amy Marie