This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/17/2021 at 15:35:03 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE vs WILLIAMS, GAFORD

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WILLIAMS, GAFORD. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Marlewski, Ann .. Christine, Marlewski, Christine. Ann ., Alvarez, M.. Lindsay and Alvarez, Lindsay. M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5149

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Marlewski, Ann .. Christine

Marlewski, Christine. Ann .

Alvarez, M.. Lindsay

Alvarez, Lindsay. M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE

Riverview, FL 33579

Respondent

WILLIAMS, GAFORD

Riverview, FL 33579

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILE; Comment: DISSOLUTION W/ CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE; Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketANSWER- WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Additional Info: Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket12 RULES OF COURTROOM BEHAVIOR; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE; Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE; Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Respondent: WILLIAMS, GAFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: WILLIAMS, VERONIQUE LAVILLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCOURT INTERPRETER DETERMINATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less