This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/31/2022 at 12:44:36 (UTC).

MIKE, WILLIAM vs AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 MIKE, WILLIAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, S. Susan and Lopez, Susan. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6566

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAM MIKE AND JACALYN MIKE

Maitland, FL 32751

MIKE, JACALYN

MIKE, WILLIAM

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOD , ANGELA ALEXANDRA

Attorney at ANGELA WOOD

350 North Lake Destiny Rd

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorney

VAGNONI , LAUREN MARIE

Attorney at AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF

5426 Bay Center Dr Ste 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA, MICHAEL SPEROUNES, JULY 13, 2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, JACALYN; Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND EMAIL DESIGNATION , ANGELA WOOD , ESQ FOR THE PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, JACALYN; Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES ; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Comment: LAUREN M. VAGNONI, ESQUIRE, August 1, 2022 through August 15, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIKE, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOD, ANGELA ALEXANDRA