This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/10/2023 at 00:45:25 (UTC).

Whitehead, Gary vs Equifax Information Solutions LLC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 Whitehead, Gary filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Equifax Information Solutions LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, N. Jack, Gutman, Jack. N and Gutman, Jack N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4947

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

Gutman, Jack N

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Whitehead, Gary

Defendant

Equifax Information Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCARANGELLA, BRIDGET LYNN

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/07/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/07/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

09/08/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/14/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

09/30/2022: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Other REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 306 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Gutman, Jack N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Gutman, Jack N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Equifax Information Solutions LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SOLUTIONS LLC 9/12/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Gary;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Equifax Information Solutions LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Gary;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Gary;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Gary;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Gary;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less