This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 06/06/2023 at 18:09:05 (UTC).

Whitehead, Christine vs Frontier Communications of America Inc

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Whitehead, Christine filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Frontier Communications of America Inc. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judges overseeing this case are Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh, Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. . and Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2756

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. .

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Whitehead, Christine

Defendants

Frontier Communications of America Inc

Verizon Wireless Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKWOOD , WESTLEY FRANK

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/17/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/17/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/17/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/17/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/17/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/22/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/22/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

03/22/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

04/25/2023: ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY

NOTICE OF RELEASE FROM STAY

06/01/2023: NOTICE OF RELEASE FROM STAY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order Transferred; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELEASE FROM STAY; Comment: JUDGE AGM; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications of America Inc; Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services LLC; Plaintiff: Whitehead, Christine;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION HT AND STAY; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications of America Inc; Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services LLC; Plaintiff: Whitehead, Christine; Date Signed: 04/25/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Frontier Communications of America Inc; Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Christine;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Christine;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Christine;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Christine;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Whitehead, Christine;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less