This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/30/2023 at 13:15:38 (UTC).

White Mangrove Holdings LLC vs FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 White Mangrove Holdings LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher, Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, Christopher C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0682

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, Christopher C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

White Mangrove Holdings LLC

Defendant

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRYL , GREGORY NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorney

SIMMS-PETREDIS , JACQUELINE A

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/25/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/25/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/25/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO - FOR

02/14/2023: MOTION TO - FOR

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/14/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

LIS PENDENS

02/17/2023: LIS PENDENS

ANSWER

03/07/2023: ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: White Mangrove Holdings LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Additional Info: Defendant: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: White Mangrove Holdings LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: White Mangrove Holdings LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: White Mangrove Holdings LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less