This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/31/2023 at 09:43:48 (UTC).

Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC vs Casale, Bryan

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Casale, Bryan. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7182

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC

WESTSHORE MULTIFAMILY TAMPA LP

Defendant

Casale, Bryan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

CERIALE , MATTHEW AGOJO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

05/17/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

MOTION FOR REHEARING

04/11/2022: MOTION FOR REHEARING

COURT TICKET

03/31/2022: COURT TICKET

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

03/19/2022: MEMORANDUM OF LAW

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/08/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER DENYING MOTION

03/07/2022: ORDER DENYING MOTION

COURT TICKET

02/28/2022: COURT TICKET

RESPONSE

02/21/2022: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF FILING

06/08/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

EVIDENCE DATA SHEET

05/18/2023: EVIDENCE DATA SHEET

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

05/22/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

COURT TICKET

05/15/2023: COURT TICKET

DEPOSITION OF

05/15/2023: DEPOSITION OF

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

05/12/2023: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

EXHIBIT

05/12/2023: EXHIBIT

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

05/10/2023: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

05/09/2023: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: Transcript of the hearing proceedings - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE DATA SHEET; Comment: EDS# 231027

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 305View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Casale, Bryan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEPOSITION OF; Additional Info: Defendant: Casale, Bryan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Defendant: Casale, Bryan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Defendant: Casale, Bryan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Defendant: Casale, Bryan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Casale, Bryan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westshore Multifamily Tampa GP LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less