This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 05:05:41 (UTC).

Westlake Services Llc vs Garcia, Carlos

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 Westlake Services Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Garcia, Carlos. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael, Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, Michael J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2995

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

Hooi, Michael J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Westlake Services Llc

P.O. Box 3275

Tampa, FL 33601

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

Estrada, Elisa

Riverview, FL 33578

Garcia, Carlos

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIGH , ROBERT ALEXANDER

Attorney at ROBERT A. VIGH

Po Box 3275

Tampa, FL 33601

Defendant Attorney

WESTON , MICHAEL W

Attorney at WESTON LEGAL

714 Ne 13Th St Ste B

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/30/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/30/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/30/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

05/03/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST

05/03/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

05/02/2022: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/30/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

03/25/2022: DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

03/25/2022: DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/16/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

02/24/2022: NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

COURT TICKET

02/21/2022: COURT TICKET

ORDER SETTING MEDIATION

02/21/2022: ORDER SETTING MEDIATION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Estrada, Elisa; Defendant: Garcia, Carlos; Date 2: 03/30/2022; Judicial Officer: Hooi, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Comment: NO AGREEMENT REACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Comment: NO AGREEMENT REACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Additional Info: Defendant: Estrada, Elisa; Defendant: Garcia, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION; Comment: 3/24/22 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/82393131402 MEETING ID: 823 9313 1402NO PASSWORD REQUIRED Judicial Officer: Hooi, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ELISA ESTRADA, 1/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Estrada, Elisa; Defendant: Garcia, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Westlake Services Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIGH , ROBERT A