This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/18/2021 at 10:18:44 (UTC).

WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC vs WALLER, DAWN M.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against WALLER, DAWN M. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4563

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

4131 Gunn Highway

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendants

WALLER, DAWN M.

Tampa, FL 33626

TENANT #1, UNKNOWN

TENANT #2, UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AYO , CRISTINA J.

Attorney at MS. CRISTINA J. AYO

Shumaker, Loop, Kendrick, Llp 101 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/07/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/05/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/08/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/08/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/08/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: WALLER, DAWN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: WALLER, DAWN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DAWN M WALLER 12/15/20; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT 1; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE; Comment: UNKNOWN TENANT 2; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: WALLER, DAWN M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: TENANT #1, UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: TENANT #2, UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Comment: DAWN M WALLER

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: WESTCHASE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less