Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/30/2021 at 03:46:52 (UTC).

WEST, MALCOLM vs GWYN, TYRONE ANGELO

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 WEST, MALCOLM filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GWYN, TYRONE ANGELO. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, Frances M, Perrone, Frances. M and Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5239

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, Frances M

Perrone, Frances. M

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEST, MALCOLM

Wesley Chapel, FL 33544

Respondent

GWYN, TYRONE ANGELO

Lutz, FL 33549

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Comment: Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-04-27 12:32. ; Additional Info: Petitioner: WEST, MALCOLM; Respondent: GWYN, TYRONE ANGELO; Date Signed: 04/27/2021; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: ODRS-ORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: WEST, MALCOLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, STALKING, PETITION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: GWYN, TYRONE ANGELO; Date Served: 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR STALKING VIOLENCE; Comment: Your request for a temporary injunction against Stalking Violence has been granted. The judge has set a hearing, The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are ; Additional Info: Petitioner: WEST, MALCOLM; Respondent: GWYN, TYRONE ANGELO; Date Signed: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Additional Info: Petitioner: WEST, MALCOLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFILE SENT TO; Comment: TAMPA VIA INTEROFFICE. DOCUMENTS - TEMPORARY ORDER, SHERIFF INFO, INFO SHEET, PETITION, NOT. OF RELATED CASES, DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER, INTAKE QUESTIONNAIRE, COVID QUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Respondent: GWYN, TYRONE ANGELO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less