This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/16/2023 at 00:42:46 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. vs Walden, Deandre A

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Walden, Deandre A. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0047

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

12425 28Th St N Suite 200

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendants

Unknown Spouse of Deandre A Walden

Riverview, FL 33578

Unknown Tenant 1

Riverview, FL 33578

Unknown Tenant 2

Riverview, FL 33578

Walden, Deandre A

Riverview, FL 33578

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANNING , PETER EARL

Attorney at EXL LEGAL, PLLC

12425 28Th St N Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendant Attorney

GHAEENZADEH , AMIR

Attorney at AMETHYST LAW GROUP, LLC

1704 Aurora Rd

Melbourne, FL 32935

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

12/02/2022: LIS PENDENS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/09/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

01/06/2023: COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

SWORN STATEMENT

01/05/2023: SWORN STATEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

01/05/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

12/30/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

12/30/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/30/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/30/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

12/30/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

12/30/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

ANSWER

12/28/2022: ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

12/05/2022: Streamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

12/05/2022: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023009932; Judge: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: 9910 LORAYNE ROAD RIVERVIEW, FL 33578-5022; Additional Info: Defendant: Walden, Deandre A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEFT: DEANDRE A WALDEN A/K/A DEANDRE WALDEN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DEFT: F/K/A EILLEENYS M. WALDEN A/K/A EILLEENYS WALDEN- 12/09/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
Please note that some of the information in this case has been redacted.