This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/09/2022 at 04:42:21 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank N.A. vs Suarez, Olga L

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Wells Fargo Bank N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Suarez, Olga L. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5838

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

1000 W. Mcnab Road 3Rd Floor

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Defendant

Suarez, Olga L

Tampa, FL 33612-5014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPLAN DE ENGLE , MAR A FLORENCIA GONZALEZ

Attorney at NADERPOUR & ASSOCIATES, PA

1000 W Mcnab Rd Fl 3

Pompano Beach, FL 33069

Defendant Attorney

MORLA , PABLO B

Attorney at MORLA LAW GROUP, P.A.

3621 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE

08/12/2022: NOTICE

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/12/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/15/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/22/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

CONSENT

08/22/2022: CONSENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Suarez, Olga L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Suarez, Olga L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: OLGA L SUAREZ 8/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Suarez, Olga L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caplan de Engle, Maria Florencia Gonzalez